+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Chiu.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 28).
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 22).
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor