+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1522.)
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2019: AB 353 Muratsuchi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor