+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor