+ − Summaries (13)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3211.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3211.)
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 2759.).
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 2737.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2715.)
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1925.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 12, 2015: AB 35 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) AB35 Chiu By Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
September 11, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) AB35 Chiu By Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2015: AB 35 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
May 18, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 7