+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2022.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4600.)
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Senate Rules suspended
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 3616.).
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rule 26 invoked. (Reyes).
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 1715.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26).
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 23).
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
May 12, 2022: AB 35 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 12
May 11, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2022: Assembly 2nd Reading AB35 Reyes et al. By Umberg
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2021: AB 35 Chau Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor