+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6822.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5439.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 1547.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2018: AB 349 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 3
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB349 McCarty By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 12, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 15, 2017: AB 349 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 9
May 10, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2017: Be re-referred to the Committees on [Veterans Affairs] and [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2