+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1807.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2013: AB 349 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 1, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor