+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12).
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 12, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor