+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2891.).
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2281.).
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2019: AB 34 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB34 Ramos et al. By Rubio
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2019: AB 34 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor