+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor