+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5331.).
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4732.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On May 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2020: AB 3372 REV. & TAX. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BURKE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 28, 2020: Consent Calendar AB3372 REV. & TAX.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 29, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 8, 2020: AB 3372 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
May 18, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Revenue and Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor