+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor