+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2501.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1813.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB333 Quirk et al. By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 40
July 10, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: AB 333 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 20, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor