+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 5467.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4.).
On August 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 1864.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 13).
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2020: AB 331 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
August 31, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB331 Medina et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
August 20, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2019: AB 331 Medina Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
March 13, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor