+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On December 4, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9