+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (45)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 680, Statutes of 2016.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.).
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5296.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4966.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4976.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) .
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1858.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (15)
August 31, 2016: AB 33 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB33 Quirk By Hueso Reconsider
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
August 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
August 24, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
June 3, 2015: AB 33 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor