+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 10, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.).
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 708.)
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12).
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 17, 2019: Consent Calendar AB328
- Yeas: 40
June 4, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
March 18, 2019: AB 328 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 12, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: No Votes Recorded: Petrie-Norris
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor