+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5283.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5438.)
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 19.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2018: Consent Calendar AB3256 A.,E.,S.,T.,
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2018: AB 3256 A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
May 23, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media
Type:
Primary Sponsor