+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 18. Page 5450.).
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4405.).
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 12).
On August 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 4799.)
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 31, 2020: AB 3214 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 13
August 28, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3214 Limón et al. By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 10, 2020: AB 3214 Limón Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 10
June 3, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 13, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor