+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.).
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1385.)
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AB321
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
May 4, 2017: AB 321 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1