+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6866.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5776.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5511.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2018: AB 3205 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3205 O'Donnell et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 3205 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor