+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3419.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2762.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1915.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On March 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2019: AB 32 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB32 Bonta et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 32 Bonta Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
February 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor