+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2745.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.)
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 854.)
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 1, 2015: AB 32 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2015: Special Consent #8 AB32 Waldron By Glazer
- Yeas: 40
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2015: AB 32 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor