+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5510.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
May 30, 2018: AB 3193 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10