+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor