+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 905, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6897.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 5904.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 7. Page 2053.)
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.)
- Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 1755.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2018: AB 315 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 28, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB315 Wood et al. By Hernandez
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2017: AB 315 WOOD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 15
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3