+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4630.)
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor