+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 596, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6863.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5775.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5508.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2018: AB 3142 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3142 Low et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2018: AB 3142 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Hill
Type:
Primary Sponsor