+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 883, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 6663.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 5653.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 16. Page 5563.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2018: AB 3129 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 8
August 23, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3129 Rubio By Skinner
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 3129 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 17
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor