+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 950, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6662.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5642.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5549.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2018: AB 3118 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3118 Chiu et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 3118 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7