+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 949, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6363.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5206.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 3109 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Consent Calendar AB3109
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2018: AB 3109 STONE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 8
May 8, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1