+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
May 12, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor