+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
On January 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor