+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 9, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor