+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3901.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2020: AB 31 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
April 22, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor