+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On December 4, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor