+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor