+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1486.).
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6).
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 723.)
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14).
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB309 Maienschein By Jackson
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 6, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2017: AB 309 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2017: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor