+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 7150.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 6080.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6005.)
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 6005.)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5548.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: AB 3089 Thurmond Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3089 Thurmond et al. By Beall Reconsider
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3089 Thurmond et al. By Beall Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 14
July 2, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 3089 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13