+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 7035.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 6010.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27).
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 5627.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24).
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2018: AB 3081 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 8
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB3081 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 31, 2018: AB 3081 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 8
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
April 18, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor