+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3406.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2747.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1794.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2019: AB 308 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB308 Muratsuchi et al. By Archuleta
- Yeas: 40
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 308 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 8, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1