+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2768.).
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1580.)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2013: AB 308 HAGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB308 Hagman By Liu
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2013: AB 308 HAGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor