+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3015.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 647.)
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14).
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 7, 2017: AB 307 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 5, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB307 Maienschein By Hill
- Yeas: 40
July 18, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
March 20, 2017: AB 307 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor