+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and E.S. & T.M.
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor