+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
On May 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor