+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2866.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.)
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2403.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1347.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
September 3, 2015: AB 303 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB303 Gonzalez By Nguyen
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2015: AB 303 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2015: AB 303 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor