+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 2835.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2344.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 8).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 1866.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 8).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 3, 2015: AB 302 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB302 Cristina Garcia By Liu
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
August 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: AB 302 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor