+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 3048.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2595.).
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 1259.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 29).
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 10, 2015: AB 30 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 10
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB30 Alejo By Block
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 29, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2015: AB 30 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 11
April 29, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media]
- Yeas: 7
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor