+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died on unfinished business file, reconsideration pending.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 21. Page 4733.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4700.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
On March 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: AB 2990 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 31
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor