+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 224, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
- Action rescinded whereby bill was ordered to enrollment and whereby the bill was enrolled and presented to the Governor.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.)
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13).
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2019: Consent Calendar AB299
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
March 28, 2019: AB 299 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
March 20, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
March 13, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor